Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/17/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 07/17/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/26/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/27/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/01/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/01/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/01/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/29/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/02/2008