Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/11/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/11/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/26/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/26/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/27/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/01/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/01/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/04/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/10/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/15/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/15/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/16/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/18/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/22/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/22/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/23/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/23/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/24/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/24/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/29/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/29/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/29/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 10/31/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/31/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/09/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/04/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/17/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/22/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/07/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/12/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/13/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/09/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/24/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/15/2008