Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/11/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/11/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/11/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/03/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/20/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/08/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/08/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/08/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/08/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/08/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/08/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/08/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/04/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/04/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/04/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/28/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/01/2008