Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 06/28/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 12/11/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/12/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/13/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/10/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/24/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/08/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/23/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/09/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/22/2008