Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/28/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/28/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 06/28/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/11/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/11/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/17/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/17/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/17/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/17/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/17/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/18/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/19/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/19/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/24/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/24/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 08/01/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/01/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 08/01/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/01/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 08/01/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/01/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 08/01/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/01/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 08/01/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 08/01/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/02/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/02/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 08/02/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/02/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 08/02/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 08/02/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 08/02/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/02/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 08/02/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/02/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/02/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/02/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 08/02/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 08/02/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/31/2008