Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/28/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/28/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/28/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/18/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/18/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/18/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/18/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/27/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/27/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/04/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/04/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/04/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/04/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/04/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/10/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/10/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/10/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/20/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/20/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/27/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/27/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/02/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/02/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/02/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/02/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/02/2007