Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/22/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/22/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/22/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/22/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/25/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/25/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/10/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/10/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/12/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/12/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/12/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/12/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/12/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/12/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/12/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/12/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/12/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/12/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/12/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/12/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/12/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/12/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/17/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/17/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/17/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/17/2007