Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/05/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/05/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/09/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/09/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/09/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/09/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/09/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/11/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 01/11/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/11/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/16/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/16/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 01/18/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 01/19/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/19/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/17/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/08/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/06/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/05/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/12/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/20/2008