Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/19/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 06/19/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/19/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/19/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/14/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/14/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/14/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/14/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/14/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/14/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 09/14/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/17/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/18/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/18/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/18/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/18/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/18/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/27/2007