Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/05/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/22/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/22/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/22/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/29/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/07/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/07/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/05/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/23/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/03/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008