Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/12/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/27/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/27/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/01/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/01/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/01/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/01/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/23/2008