Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/27/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/16/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/24/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/01/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/01/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/01/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/06/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/06/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/07/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/26/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/10/2008