Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/06/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/15/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/17/2008