Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/08/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/12/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/16/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/12/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/07/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/17/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/07/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/27/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/13/2008