Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/05/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/05/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/07/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/18/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/20/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/20/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/21/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/27/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/11/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/11/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/11/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/25/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/27/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/10/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/05/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/06/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/07/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 12/05/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/27/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/26/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/19/2008