Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/14/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/12/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/12/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/01/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/01/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/07/2008