Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/14/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/14/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/14/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/12/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/30/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/01/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/05/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/18/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/18/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/03/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/03/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/03/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/04/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/12/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/13/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/18/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/19/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/01/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/01/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/01/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/01/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/03/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/01/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/07/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/07/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/07/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/07/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/21/2008