Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/26/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 07/26/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/26/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/26/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/26/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/26/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/26/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/26/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/26/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/26/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/26/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/26/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/26/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/26/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/26/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/26/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/26/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/26/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/26/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/26/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/26/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/26/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/26/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/26/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/26/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/26/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/26/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/04/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/25/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/25/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/25/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/25/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/25/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/25/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 10/16/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/16/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/25/2007