Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/15/2007