Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/18/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/25/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/23/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/13/2008