Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/22/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/22/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/22/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/22/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/07/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/07/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/11/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/13/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/21/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/27/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/17/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/17/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/19/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/04/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/19/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/31/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/15/2008