Refine your search

Date Major Actions
05/22/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-234.
05/22/2008 Passed Senate over veto: Passed Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 82 - 13. Record Vote Number: 140.(consideration: CR S4749)
05/21/2008 Passed House over veto: Two-thirds of the Members present having voted in the affirmative the bill is passed, the Passed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 316 - 108 (Roll no. 346).
05/21/2008 Vetoed by President.(text of veto message: CR H4402)
05/20/2008 Presented to President.
05/15/2008 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 81 - 15. Record Vote Number: 130.
05/14/2008 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by recorded vote: 318 - 106 (Roll no. 315).
05/13/2008 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 110-627 filed.(text of conference report: CR H3409-3700)
04/22/2008 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
04/18/2008 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
04/16/2008 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
04/15/2008 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
04/14/2008 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
12/14/2007 To conference: Senate insisted on its amendment, requested a conference.
12/14/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 79 - 14. Record Vote Number: 434.
07/27/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 231 - 191 (Roll no. 756).
07/23/2007 Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
07/23/2007 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 110-256, Part I.
05/22/2007 Introduced in House