Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/23/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/23/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/06/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/15/2007