Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/15/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/15/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/15/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/15/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/21/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/21/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/21/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/11/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/14/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/10/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/12/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/17/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/19/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/03/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/25/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/05/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/07/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/08/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/08/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/13/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/14/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/22/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/22/2008