Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/10/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/10/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/17/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/09/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/11/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/17/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/17/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/18/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/18/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/18/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/19/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/19/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/19/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/19/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/10/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/24/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/23/2008