Refine your search

Date Major Actions
08/09/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-69.
08/09/2007 Signed by President.
08/04/2007 Presented to President.
08/02/2007 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10761-10762)
08/02/2007 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by recorded vote: 367 - 57 (Roll no. 802).(consideration: CR H9605-9606)
08/01/2007 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 110-289 filed.(text of conference report: CR H9414-9465)
07/31/2007 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
07/31/2007 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
07/19/2007 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Bingaman; Inouye; Kennedy; Lieberman; Mikulski; Kerry; Nelson FL; Domenici; Stevens; Enzi; Alexander; Ensign; Coleman.(consideration: CR S9574)
07/19/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5496-5510)
05/10/2007 Introduced in House