Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/13/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/20/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/20/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/16/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/24/2008