Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/08/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/08/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/08/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/08/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/08/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/08/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/08/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/23/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/05/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/14/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/25/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/08/2007