Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/22/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/14/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew