Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/03/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/14/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/21/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/21/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/23/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/23/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/05/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/11/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/25/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/10/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/01/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/06/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/01/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/01/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/01/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/04/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/09/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/18/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/18/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/05/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/08/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 11/08/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/15/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/15/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/16/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/22/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/27/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/09/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/09/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/09/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/14/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/12/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/19/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/08/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/14/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/16/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/08/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/08/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/18/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/25/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew