Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/15/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/22/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/18/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/26/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/26/2007