Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/03/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/05/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/05/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/05/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/27/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/27/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/04/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/18/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/06/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/06/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/04/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/04/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/06/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/13/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/19/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/13/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/02/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/19/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/26/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/31/2008