Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/02/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/09/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/09/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/17/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/17/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/17/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/17/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/24/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/07/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/07/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/13/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/13/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/13/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/13/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/13/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/28/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/28/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/11/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/11/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/18/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/26/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 08/03/2007