Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/30/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/30/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/30/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/30/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/30/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/30/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/30/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/02/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/02/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/02/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/03/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/07/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/07/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/09/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/09/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/14/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/15/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/15/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/15/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/16/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/21/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/23/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/05/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/11/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/13/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/13/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/19/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/25/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/25/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/26/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/27/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/10/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/10/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/11/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/12/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/12/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/18/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/24/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/30/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/11/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/03/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/28/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew