Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/20/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/10/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/24/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/11/2007