Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/12/2008