Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/23/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/23/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/01/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/01/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/14/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/14/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/14/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/14/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 08/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/17/2008