Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/14/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/24/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/27/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/30/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/31/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/31/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/31/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/02/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/02/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/04/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/04/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/04/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/06/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/06/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/07/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/07/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/10/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/14/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/14/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/20/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/27/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/27/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/27/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/01/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/01/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/10/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/22/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/07/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/05/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/05/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/06/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/13/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/19/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/16/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 01/17/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/17/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/22/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/28/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/07/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/26/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/26/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/06/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/13/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/13/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/14/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/31/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/22/2008