Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/29/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/29/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/14/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/14/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/14/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/14/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/14/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/14/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/21/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/21/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/21/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/21/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/06/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/06/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/26/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/11/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/11/2007