Refine your search

Date Major Actions
11/08/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-112.
11/08/2007 Signed by President.
11/01/2007 Presented to President.
10/31/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/31/2007 Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13646)
10/23/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 988).(text: CR H11873)
03/29/2007 Introduced in House