Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/17/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/23/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/23/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/23/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/24/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/26/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/26/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/03/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/07/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/07/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/08/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/08/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/16/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/16/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 05/16/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/22/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/11/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/11/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/14/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/18/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/12/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/12/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/30/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/30/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 08/03/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/04/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/09/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/18/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/28/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/28/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/25/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/04/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/17/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/22/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/30/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/31/2008