Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/19/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/20/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/24/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/26/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/01/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/01/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/02/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/10/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/10/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/10/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/10/2007