Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/17/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/23/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/26/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/26/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/07/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/08/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/10/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/10/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/10/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/21/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/21/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/11/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/20/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2007