Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/27/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/24/2007