Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/26/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/26/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/16/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/07/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/08/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/08/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/14/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/16/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/16/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/21/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/05/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/12/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/12/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/18/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/19/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/21/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/26/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/28/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/11/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/18/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/26/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/31/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/02/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/04/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/04/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/04/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/04/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/05/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/14/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/17/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/24/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/24/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/25/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/27/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/05/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/01/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/19/2008