Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/23/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/23/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/25/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/25/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/21/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/25/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/25/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/25/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/12/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/12/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/31/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/31/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/31/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/31/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/31/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/31/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 08/01/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 08/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 08/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 08/03/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/05/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/24/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/18/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/15/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 12/11/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/11/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/16/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/23/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/06/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/14/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/05/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/05/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/11/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/02/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/06/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/13/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/11/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/23/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/24/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/25/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/11/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/11/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/25/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/26/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/26/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew