Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/21/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/21/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/21/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/21/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/21/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/21/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/21/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/21/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/21/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/23/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/23/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/27/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/27/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/27/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/27/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/29/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/29/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/02/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/02/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2008