Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/29/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/20/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/20/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/17/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/17/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/07/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/07/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/07/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/07/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/14/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/14/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/14/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/14/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/26/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/26/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 08/02/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/06/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/06/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/15/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/15/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/18/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/06/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 12/13/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/28/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/03/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/03/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/10/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/17/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/24/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/19/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/26/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/17/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/11/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/11/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/18/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/25/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/25/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/29/2008