Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/15/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/19/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/20/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/23/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/26/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/26/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/24/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/14/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/23/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/11/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/27/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/04/2008