Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/22/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/22/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/27/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/13/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/03/2008